Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Apprentices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296 (SB0305/CH0224)
Title
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0529 /CH0376 (SB0463)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising Morticians
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572 /CH0620
Title
Natural Resources - Tree Expert License - Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253 (SB0662/CH0519)
Title
Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1301 /CH0412
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Limited License - Hairstylist
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 /CH0224 (HB0296)
Title
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463 (HB0529/CH0376)
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising Morticians
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 /CH0519 (HB1253)
Title
Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1022
Title
Prince George's County - Green Business Zones
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0296 (SB0305/CH0224) Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0529 /CH0376 (SB0463) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising Morticians Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0572 /CH0620 Natural Resources - Tree Expert License - Qualifications Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1253 (SB0662/CH0519) Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1301 /CH0412 State Board of Cosmetologists - Limited License - Hairstylist Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0305 /CH0224 (HB0296) Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Finance Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Finance
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0463 (HB0529/CH0376) State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising Morticians Senator Conway 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0662 /CH0519 (HB1253) Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0664 Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - Repeal Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1022 Prince George's County - Green Business Zones Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Budget and Taxation
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM