Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Aquaculture

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0166 (SB0021/CH0165)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Reporting Date
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306 (SB0464/CH0057)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Shellfish Nursery Permits
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0357 /CH0235 (SB0344/CH0234)
Title
Potomac River Fisheries Commission - Inspection Tax and Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Wood
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0021 /CH0165 (HB0072/CH0166)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Reporting Date
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 /CH0234 (HB0357/CH0235)
Title
Potomac River Fisheries Commission - Inspection Tax and Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0464 /CH0057 (HB0306)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Shellfish Nursery Permits
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0166 (SB0021/CH0165) Natural Resources - Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Reporting Date Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0306 (SB0464/CH0057) Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Shellfish Nursery Permits Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0357 /CH0235 (SB0344/CH0234) Potomac River Fisheries Commission - Inspection Tax and Penalty Delegate Wood 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0021 /CH0165 (HB0072/CH0166) Natural Resources - Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Reporting Date Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0344 /CH0234 (HB0357/CH0235) Potomac River Fisheries Commission - Inspection Tax and Penalty Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0464 /CH0057 (HB0306) Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Shellfish Nursery Permits Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM