Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Aquaculture

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0051 /CH0082 (SB0051)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208 (SB0139)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Jobs Training Center
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0758
Title
Natural Resources - County Oyster Committees
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0799 /CH0278
Title
Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916
Title
Study on Harvesting Hard-Shell Clams in the Atlantic Coastal Bays and Aquaculture Areas in the Chincoteague Bay
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1527 /CH0142
Title
Environment - Water Appropriation Permit - Aquaculture Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0051 (HB0051/CH0082)
Title
Natural Resources - Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139 (HB0208)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Jobs Training Center
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0964
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - County Oyster Committees
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0051 /CH0082 (SB0051) Natural Resources - Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Membership Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0208 (SB0139) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Jobs Training Center Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0758 Natural Resources - County Oyster Committees Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0799 /CH0278 Aquaculture - Liability for Trespass Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0916 Study on Harvesting Hard-Shell Clams in the Atlantic Coastal Bays and Aquaculture Areas in the Chincoteague Bay Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2016 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1527 /CH0142 Environment - Water Appropriation Permit - Aquaculture Exemption Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0051 (HB0051/CH0082) Natural Resources - Aquaculture Coordinating Council - Membership Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0139 (HB0208) Creation of a State Debt - Talbot County - Phillips Wharf Aquaculture Jobs Training Center Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 AM
SB0964 Natural Resources - Oysters - County Oyster Committees Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM