Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Aquaculture

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028 /CH0236 (SB0939/CH0237)
Title
Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0298 /CH0017 (SB0448/CH0754)
Title
Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0377
Title
Natural Resources - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation Protection Zones - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0406 /CH0362
Title
Wetlands and Waterways Program - State-Owned Lakes - Structural Shoreline Stabilization
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0408
Title
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Trust Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841 /CH0238
Title
Aquaculture - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation - Placement of Shellfish, Bags, Nets, and Structures
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1309 (SB0876)
Title
Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Natural Resources - Crab Harvest - Start Time
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0448 /CH0754 (HB0298/CH0017)
Title
Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0830 (HB0720)
Title
Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876 (HB1309)
Title
Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 /CH0236 (SB0939/CH0237) Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2019 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0298 /CH0017 (SB0448/CH0754) Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration Delegate Busch 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/4/2019) - Chapter 17
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0377 Natural Resources - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation Protection Zones - Revisions Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0406 /CH0362 Wetlands and Waterways Program - State-Owned Lakes - Structural Shoreline Stabilization Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0408 Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Trust Fund Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0841 /CH0238 Aquaculture - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation - Placement of Shellfish, Bags, Nets, and Structures Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1309 (SB0876) Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 Natural Resources - Crab Harvest - Start Time Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0448 /CH0754 (HB0298/CH0017) Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 754
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0830 (HB0720) Natural Resources - Fishery Management Plans - Oysters Senator Elfreth 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0876 (HB1309) Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2019 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:17 PM