Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Arbitration -see also- Mediation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505 /CH0670 (SB0390/CH0669)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0667 (SB0553)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795
Title
Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0869 (SB0574)
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0992
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159 (SB0773)
Title
Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - Restrictions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1170 (SB0250)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1228 (SB0832)
Title
Education - Grounds for Discipline
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor Disputes
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0250 (HB1170)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0363
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0390 /CH0669 (HB0505/CH0670)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447
Title
Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0553 (HB0667)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0574 (HB0869)
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0773 (HB1159)
Title
Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - Restrictions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0832 (HB1228)
Title
Education - Grounds for Discipline
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0505 /CH0670 (SB0390/CH0669) Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0667 (SB0553) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0760 Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Alterations Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0795 Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0869 (SB0574) Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0992 Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - Repeal Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1159 (SB0773) Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - Restrictions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1170 (SB0250) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1228 (SB0832) Education - Grounds for Discipline Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0101 Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor Disputes Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0250 (HB1170) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0363 Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0390 /CH0669 (HB0505/CH0670) Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective Bargaining Senator Middleton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0447 Maryland Environmental Service - Collective Bargaining Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0553 (HB0667) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0574 (HB0869) Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0773 (HB1159) Consumer Protection - Debt Buyers and Collectors - Restrictions President 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0832 (HB1228) Education - Grounds for Discipline Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM