Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Arbitration -see also- Mediation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0497 (SB0760)
Title
Education - Grounds for Discipline
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670
Title
Harford County - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676 (SB0670)
Title
Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0871 (SB0652)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0225
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652 (HB0871)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 (HB0676)
Title
Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing Documents
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0760 (HB0497)
Title
Education - Grounds for Discipline
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0497 (SB0760) Education - Grounds for Discipline Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0670 Harford County - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0676 (SB0670) Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing Documents Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0871 (SB0652) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0225 Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0652 (HB0871) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0670 (HB0676) Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing Documents Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0760 (HB0497) Education - Grounds for Discipline Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM