Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Arbitration -see also- Mediation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077 /CH0346 (SB0258/CH0347)
Title
Condominiums - Claims Against Developers and Vendors - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278 /CH0127
Title
Montgomery County – Housing Opportunities Commission – Binding Arbitration – Revisions MC 14–18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0667 (SB0408)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1758 (SB0639/CH0013)
Title
Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 /CH0347 (HB0077/CH0346)
Title
Condominiums – Claims Against Developers and Vendors – Unenforceability of Certain Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408 (HB0667)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0639 /CH0013 (HB1758)
Title
Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0077 /CH0346 (SB0258/CH0347) Condominiums - Claims Against Developers and Vendors - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Environment and Transportation
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0278 /CH0127 Montgomery County – Housing Opportunities Commission – Binding Arbitration – Revisions MC 14–18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0667 (SB0408) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1758 (SB0639/CH0013) Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing Procedures Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0258 /CH0347 (HB0077/CH0346) Condominiums – Claims Against Developers and Vendors – Unenforceability of Certain Provisions Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0408 (HB0667) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0639 /CH0013 (HB1758) Education - Public School Personnel - Disciplinary Hearing Procedures Senator Guzzone 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 13
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM