Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Architects

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0040 (SB0386)
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379 (SB0324)
Title
Minority Business Enterprise Participation - Liquidated Damages - Architectural or Engineering Services
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0455 (SB0387)
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720 /CH0270
Title
Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0738 /CH0271
Title
Jurisdiction of the State Ethics Commission and the Maryland State Board of Contract Appeals - Participation in Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1084 (SB0581)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland Design Excellence Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 /CH0012
Title
Task Force to Study Small and Minority Design Firm Participation in State Procurement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 (HB0379)
Title
Minority Business Enterprise Participation - Liquidated Damages - Architectural or Engineering Services
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0040)
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 (HB0455)
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 (HB1084)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland Design Excellence Commission
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0040 (SB0386) Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0379 (SB0324) Minority Business Enterprise Participation - Liquidated Damages - Architectural or Engineering Services Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0455 (SB0387) Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0720 /CH0270 Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm Permits Delegate Vaughn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0738 /CH0271 Jurisdiction of the State Ethics Commission and the Maryland State Board of Contract Appeals - Participation in Procurement Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1084 (SB0581) Business and Economic Development - Maryland Design Excellence Commission Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0109 /CH0012 Task Force to Study Small and Minority Design Firm Participation in State Procurement Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0324 (HB0379) Minority Business Enterprise Participation - Liquidated Damages - Architectural or Engineering Services Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0386 (HB0040) Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0387 (HB0455) Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0581 (HB1084) Business and Economic Development - Maryland Design Excellence Commission Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM