Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Archives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 /CH0552 (SB0516)
Title
State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0148 /CH0111
Title
State Archives - Care of Fine Art or Decorative Art - Procurement Exemption
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0165 /CH0553 (SB0137/CH0554)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169 (SB0091)
Title
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Audio Recordings and Documents (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0438 (SB0253)
Title
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1241
Title
Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0044 /CH0539
Title
Records Management and Preservation - State Units and Public Officials - Responsibilities
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 (HB0169)
Title
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 /CH0554 (HB0165/CH0553)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253 (HB0438)
Title
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0516 (HB0078/CH0552)
Title
State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0078 /CH0552 (SB0516) State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2017 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0148 /CH0111 State Archives - Care of Fine Art or Decorative Art - Procurement Exemption Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2017 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0165 /CH0553 (SB0137/CH0554) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2017 - 3:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0169 (SB0091) State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Audio Recordings and Documents (State Board of Elections Transparency Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0438 (SB0253) Legislative Transparency Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1241 Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - Requirements Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0044 /CH0539 Records Management and Preservation - State Units and Public Officials - Responsibilities Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0091 (HB0169) State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 2:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2017 - 2:15 PM
SB0137 /CH0554 (HB0165/CH0553) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0253 (HB0438) Legislative Transparency Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0516 (HB0078/CH0552) State Government - Maryland Manual - Revisions (Maryland Manual Modernization Act) Senator Zucker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM