Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Arrests

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920 (SB0705)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942
Title
Real Property – Body Attachments – Debt Related to Residential Tenancy
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289
Title
Correctional Services - Arrested Persons - Mental Disorder Screenings
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302 /CH0250
Title
Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1461
Title
Criminal Procedure – Immigration – Supporting All Families Everywhere (SAFE Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1803 (SB1241)
Title
Baltimore City - Independent Institutions of Higher Education - Police Force
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 (HB0920)
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1034
Title
Human Services – State Public Assistance Eligibility – Arrest Warrant
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1241 (HB1803)
Title
Baltimore City - Independent Institutions of Higher Education - Police Force
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0920 (SB0705) Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0942 Real Property – Body Attachments – Debt Related to Residential Tenancy Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1289 Correctional Services - Arrested Persons - Mental Disorder Screenings Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1302 /CH0250 Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 AM
HB1461 Criminal Procedure – Immigration – Supporting All Families Everywhere (SAFE Act) Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1803 (SB1241) Baltimore City - Independent Institutions of Higher Education - Police Force Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0705 (HB0920) Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1034 Human Services – State Public Assistance Eligibility – Arrest Warrant Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1241 (HB1803) Baltimore City - Independent Institutions of Higher Education - Police Force Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM