Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Assault

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200
Title
Criminal Law - First Degree Assault - Strangulation
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0221
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0477
Title
Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before Judgment
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0478 (SB0861)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0688
Title
Criminal Law - Assault Against a Transit Vehicle Operator
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0700
Title
Criminal Law - Assault Against a Transit Vehicle Passenger
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0853 (SB0417)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0854 /CH0643 (SB0479)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1185
Title
Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Health Care Practitioners
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0417 (HB0853)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0479 (HB0854/CH0643)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0478)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0200 Criminal Law - First Degree Assault - Strangulation Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0221 Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited Actions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0477 Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before Judgment Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB0478 (SB0861) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0688 Criminal Law - Assault Against a Transit Vehicle Operator Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0700 Criminal Law - Assault Against a Transit Vehicle Passenger Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0853 (SB0417) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0854 /CH0643 (SB0479) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 643
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1185 Criminal Law - Second Degree Assault - Health Care Practitioners Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0417 (HB0853) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0479 (HB0854/CH0643) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally Responsible Senator Gladden 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0861 (HB0478) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM