Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Assault

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0022
Title
Baltimore City - Prohibition on Ordinance Eliminating or Limiting Duty to Retreat
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067
Title
Criminal Law - Self-Defense - Duty to Retreat
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090
Title
Regulated Firearms - Disqualifying Crime - Domestically Related Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0185 (SB0683)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214
Title
Criminal Law - Self-Defense - Immunity for Use of Physical Force in Defense of Dwelling
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306 /CH0116 (SB0337/CH0115)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0309 /CH0114 (SB0334/CH0113)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 (SB0264)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0622
Title
Criminal Law - First Degree Assault - Strangulation
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0710 (SB0483/CH0510)
Title
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1183 (SB0797)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1185
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264 (HB0312)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - Prohibition
Sponsor
Baltimore City Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334 /CH0113 (HB0309/CH0114)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0337 /CH0115 (HB0306/CH0116)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0483 /CH0510 (HB0710)
Title
Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683 (HB0185)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0797 (HB1183)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0022 Baltimore City - Prohibition on Ordinance Eliminating or Limiting Duty to Retreat Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0067 Criminal Law - Self-Defense - Duty to Retreat Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0090 Regulated Firearms - Disqualifying Crime - Domestically Related Crime Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0125 Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited Actions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Ways and Means
2/06/2014 - 2:15 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0185 (SB0683) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0214 Criminal Law - Self-Defense - Immunity for Use of Physical Force in Defense of Dwelling Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 /CH0116 (SB0337/CH0115) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0309 /CH0114 (SB0334/CH0113) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0312 (SB0264) Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - Prohibition Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0622 Criminal Law - First Degree Assault - Strangulation Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0710 (SB0483/CH0510) Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program Delegate Cullison 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1183 (SB0797) Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1185 Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1186 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2014 - 3:30 PM
SB0264 (HB0312) Criminal Law - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer - Prohibition Baltimore City Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0334 /CH0113 (HB0309/CH0114) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0337 /CH0115 (HB0306/CH0116) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0483 /CH0510 (HB0710) Labor and Employment - Nursing Homes and Health Care Facilities - Workplace Safety Assessment and Safety Program Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0683 (HB0185) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0797 (HB1183) Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM