Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Assault

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited Actions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 (SB0169)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrests - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236 /CH0410 (SB0705)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0494
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498 (SB0392)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0612
Title
Criminal Law - Stalking - Included Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0667
Title
Higher Education Institutions - Sexual Assault, Violence, and Stalking - Prevention and Outreach Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067 /CH0321
Title
Crime of Violence - Home Invasion
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137
Title
Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Crimes - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0169 (HB0133)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrests - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 (HB0498)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 (HB0236/CH0410)
Title
Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0043 Election Law - Petitions - Prohibited Actions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0133 (SB0169) Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrests - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0236 /CH0410 (SB0705) Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders Delegate Jalisi 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0494 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0498 (SB0392) Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0612 Criminal Law - Stalking - Included Acts Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0667 Higher Education Institutions - Sexual Assault, Violence, and Stalking - Prevention and Outreach Policies Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0067 /CH0321 Crime of Violence - Home Invasion Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0137 Crimes - Solicitation to Commit Crimes - Statute of Limitations Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0169 (HB0133) Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrests - Assault on Baltimore City Special Enforcement Officer Senator Gladden 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0392 (HB0498) Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0705 (HB0236/CH0410) Criminal Law - Assault - First Responders Senator Montgomery 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM