Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Assault

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222
Title
Criminal Law - Assault in the Second Degree - Educators
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0266 (SB0498)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 (SB0243)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0374 (SB0603/CH0567)
Title
Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519 (SB0903)
Title
Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights Abuses
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836
Title
Educational Institutions - Notice of Criminal Activity and Threats to Safety
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847
Title
Criminal Procedure - Crime of Violence - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0933
Title
Criminal Law - Assault in the Second Degree - Educators
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1107
Title
Baltimore City - Police Officers - Warrantless Arrests
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371 /CH0651
Title
Criminal Law - Strangulation - Lethality Screening Protocol and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1436
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Common Law Battery
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122
Title
Criminal Procedure - Reconsiderations of Sentences - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0243 (HB0304)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0498 (HB0266)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0603 /CH0567 (HB0374)
Title
Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0903 (HB0519)
Title
Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights Abuses
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0222 Criminal Law - Assault in the Second Degree - Educators Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0266 (SB0498) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0304 (SB0243) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0374 (SB0603/CH0567) Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes Delegate Anderson 4 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0519 (SB0903) Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights Abuses Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0836 Educational Institutions - Notice of Criminal Activity and Threats to Safety Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0847 Criminal Procedure - Crime of Violence - Definition Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0933 Criminal Law - Assault in the Second Degree - Educators Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1107 Baltimore City - Police Officers - Warrantless Arrests Delegate Anderson 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-13)
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1371 /CH0651 Criminal Law - Strangulation - Lethality Screening Protocol and Training Delegate Folden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1436 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Common Law Battery Delegate Folden 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0122 Criminal Procedure - Reconsiderations of Sentences - Reporting Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0243 (HB0304) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0498 (HB0266) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0603 /CH0567 (HB0374) Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior Crimes Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0903 (HB0519) Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights Abuses Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1023 Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM