Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Assisted Living -see also- Group Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0186 /CH0317
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0244
Title
Assisted Living Programs - Closure or Change of Location or Ownership - Resident and Resident Representative Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Study of Solar Photovoltaic System - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0404 (SB0418)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0437 /CH0147 (SB0537)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0456 (SB0382)
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0588
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0650 (SB0609)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 1-16
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0902 (SB0443)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Homecrest House
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0960 /CH0439 (SB0853/CH0438)
Title
Guardians of Property and Custodians - Authority to Fund Certain Trusts and Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1296
Title
Public Safety - Police Training Commission - Community Service Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1476 /CH0699 (SB0797/CH0698)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program - Mandated Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382 (HB0456)
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 (HB0404)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 (HB0902)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Homecrest House
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0537 (HB0437/CH0147)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0609 (HB0650)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 1-16
Sponsor
Howard County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0797 /CH0698 (HB1476/CH0699)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program - Mandated Funding
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 /CH0438 (HB0960/CH0439)
Title
Guardians of Property and Custodians - Authority to Fund Certain Trusts and Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0186 /CH0317 Department of Veterans Affairs - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home Fund - Establishment Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 317
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2016 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0244 Assisted Living Programs - Closure or Change of Location or Ownership - Resident and Resident Representative Notification Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0362 Department of Veterans Affairs - Study of Solar Photovoltaic System - Charlotte Hall Veterans Home Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0404 (SB0418) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0437 /CH0147 (SB0537) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0456 (SB0382) Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0588 Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0650 (SB0609) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 1-16 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0902 (SB0443) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Homecrest House Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 AM
HB0960 /CH0439 (SB0853/CH0438) Guardians of Property and Custodians - Authority to Fund Certain Trusts and Accounts Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1296 Public Safety - Police Training Commission - Community Service Requirement Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1476 /CH0699 (SB0797/CH0698) Housing and Community Development - Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program - Mandated Funding Delegate Jalisi 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 699
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0382 (HB0456) Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0418 (HB0404) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0443 (HB0902) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Homecrest House Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 AM
SB0537 (HB0437/CH0147) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Modifications Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0609 (HB0650) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Vantage House Retirement Community Renovations Ho. Co. 1-16 Howard County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 AM
SB0797 /CH0698 (HB1476/CH0699) Housing and Community Development - Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program - Mandated Funding Senator Pugh 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 698
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0853 /CH0438 (HB0960/CH0439) Guardians of Property and Custodians - Authority to Fund Certain Trusts and Accounts Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM