Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Assisted Living -see also- Group Homes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316 /CH0502
Title
Public Health - Vaccination Reporting Requirements - ImmuNet
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0738 /CH0399
Title
Dental Hygienist – Scope of Practice – Practice Settings Under General Supervision
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0832 (SB0699/CH0414)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Prohibition on Denial
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009 (SB0700)
Title
Home- and Community-Based Services Waivers - Alterations (Laurie's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1135 /CH0187 (SB0892)
Title
Carroll County – Gaming – Home Games – Bingo
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0699 /CH0414 (HB0832)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Prohibition on Denial
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700 (HB1009)
Title
Home- and Community-Based Services Waivers - Alterations (Laurie's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892 (HB1135/CH0187)
Title
Carroll County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0316 /CH0502 Public Health - Vaccination Reporting Requirements - ImmuNet Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0738 /CH0399 Dental Hygienist – Scope of Practice – Practice Settings Under General Supervision Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0832 (SB0699/CH0414) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Prohibition on Denial Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2019 - 2:00 PM
Rules
HB1009 (SB0700) Home- and Community-Based Services Waivers - Alterations (Laurie's Law) Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1135 /CH0187 (SB0892) Carroll County – Gaming – Home Games – Bingo Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0699 /CH0414 (HB0832) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Home- and Community-Based Waiver Services - Prohibition on Denial Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Finance
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0700 (HB1009) Home- and Community-Based Services Waivers - Alterations (Laurie's Law) Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Motion to refer to Budget and Taxation (Senator King) Adopted
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0892 (HB1135/CH0187) Carroll County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:18 PM