Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Auctions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 (SB0998)
Title
Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Exemptions for Auctioneers
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1127 /CH0303 (SB0634/CH0302)
Title
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0634 /CH0302 (HB1127/CH0303)
Title
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0998 (HB0782)
Title
Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Exemptions for Auctioneers
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0782 (SB0998) Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Exemptions for Auctioneers Delegate Schulz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1127 /CH0303 (SB0634/CH0302) Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Economic Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0634 /CH0302 (HB1127/CH0303) Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0998 (HB0782) Secondhand Precious Metal Object Dealers and Pawnbrokers - Exemptions for Auctioneers Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM