Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Auctions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0005
Title
Department of General Services - Declaration and Disposal of Excess and Surplus Property - Government House Furnishings
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0598
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Distribution and Sales Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0573 (SB0663/CH0572)
Title
Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1153
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 431-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663 /CH0572 (HB1113/CH0573)
Title
Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0005 Department of General Services - Declaration and Disposal of Excess and Surplus Property - Government House Furnishings Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0598 Alcoholic Beverages - Distribution and Sales Tax Revenues Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1113 /CH0573 (SB0663/CH0572) Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act) Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Economic Matters
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1153 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 431-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0663 /CH0572 (HB1113/CH0573) Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act) Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM