Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Awards, Medals and Prizes -see also- Gaming

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0003 /CH0501
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Olympic, Paralympic, Special Olympic, and Deaflympic Games Medals and Prizes
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0021 (SB0053)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Olympic and Paralympic Games Medals and Prizes
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085 /CH0474
Title
Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 (SB0496/CH0445)
Title
Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0152 /CH0023 (SB0172)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0300 /CH0451
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0350
Title
Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 16-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0464 /CH0466
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Exhibition Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 (SB0655)
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990
Title
Harford County - Bingo
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1537 /CH0449 (SB1125/CH0450)
Title
Video Lottery Facilities - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013
Title
Public Safety - State Militia
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0053 (HB0021)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Olympic and Paralympic Games Medals and Prizes
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 (HB0152/CH0023)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 /CH0452
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0655 (HB0895)
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006
Title
Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0003 /CH0501 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Olympic, Paralympic, Special Olympic, and Deaflympic Games Medals and Prizes Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Ways and Means
1/18/2017 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0021 (SB0053) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Olympic and Paralympic Games Medals and Prizes Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0085 /CH0474 Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0090 (SB0496/CH0445) Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee Payments Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0152 /CH0023 (SB0172) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0300 /CH0451 Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings Delegate Fennell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0350 Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 16-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0464 /CH0466 Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Exhibition Permit Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0895 (SB0655) Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0990 Harford County - Bingo Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1537 /CH0449 (SB1125/CH0450) Video Lottery Facilities - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - Expansion Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Ways and Means
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0013 Public Safety - State Militia Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0053 (HB0021) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Olympic and Paralympic Games Medals and Prizes Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0172 (HB0152/CH0023) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0228 /CH0452 Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings Senator Salling 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0655 (HB0895) Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1006 Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-1)
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM