Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Operating Budget (B1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0160 (SB0185/CH0570)
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2019)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161 (SB0187/CH0010)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 (SB0293)
Title
Commonsense Spending Act of 2018
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Education Trust Fund - Use of Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0954 (SB0481)
Title
Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Reserve Fund - Mandated Appropriation
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1233 (SB1248)
Title
Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1245 /CH0789
Title
Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1339 (SB0213)
Title
State Budget - Mandated Appropriations - Reductions
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1620 (SB0976)
Title
Local Health Services Funding - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1697 (SB1122/CH0357)
Title
Education - Commercial Gaming Revenues - Constitutional Amendment
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1772 (SB1206/CH0854)
Title
Transportation – Pride of Baltimore II – Funding and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1804 /CH0590
Title
Health – Medical Research Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0185 /CH0570 (HB0160)
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2019)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187 /CH0010 (HB0161)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0192
Title
Workgroup on Categories for Funding Priorities in the Annual State Budget
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0213 (HB1339)
Title
State Budget - Mandated Appropriations - Reductions
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0223
Title
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Allocation
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0293 (HB0348)
Title
Commonsense Spending Act of 2018
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0481 (HB0954)
Title
Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Reserve Fund - Mandated Appropriation
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0820
Title
State Budget
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0976 (HB1620)
Title
Local Health Services Funding - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1122 /CH0357 (HB1697)
Title
Education – Commercial Gaming Revenues – Constitutional Amendment
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1206 /CH0854 (HB1772)
Title
Transportation – Pride of Baltimore II – Funding and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1248 (HB1233)
Title
Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0160 (SB0185/CH0570) Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2019) Speaker 3 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Appropriations
HB0161 (SB0187/CH0010) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0348 (SB0293) Commonsense Spending Act of 2018 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0557 Primary and Secondary Education - Education Trust Fund - Use of Fund Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0954 (SB0481) Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Reserve Fund - Mandated Appropriation Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1233 (SB1248) Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Funding Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1245 /CH0789 Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority Delegate McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 789
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1339 (SB0213) State Budget - Mandated Appropriations - Reductions Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/15/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB1620 (SB0976) Local Health Services Funding - Modifications Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1697 (SB1122/CH0357) Education - Commercial Gaming Revenues - Constitutional Amendment Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Appropriations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
HB1772 (SB1206/CH0854) Transportation – Pride of Baltimore II – Funding and Reporting Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1804 /CH0590 Health – Medical Research Funding Delegate Busch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0185 /CH0570 (HB0160) Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2019) President 3 2 Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 570
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0187 /CH0010 (HB0161) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0192 Workgroup on Categories for Funding Priorities in the Annual State Budget Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/24/2018 - 2:15 PM
SB0213 (HB1339) State Budget - Mandated Appropriations - Reductions Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 PM
SB0223 Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Allocation Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 PM
SB0293 (HB0348) Commonsense Spending Act of 2018 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0481 (HB0954) Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Reserve Fund - Mandated Appropriation Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0820 State Budget Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0976 (HB1620) Local Health Services Funding - Modifications Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB1122 /CH0357 (HB1697) Education – Commercial Gaming Revenues – Constitutional Amendment Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 357
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB1206 /CH0854 (HB1772) Transportation – Pride of Baltimore II – Funding and Reporting Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 854
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1248 (HB1233) Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Funding Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM