Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0251 /CH0435 (SB0323)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892 /CH0427 (SB0736)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1439 (SB0473/CH0080)
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0323 (HB0251/CH0435)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0473 /CH0080 (HB1439)
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0736 (HB0892/CH0427)
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0251 /CH0435 (SB0323) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0892 /CH0427 (SB0736) St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1439 (SB0473/CH0080) Calvert County - Bonding Authority Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0323 (HB0251/CH0435) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0473 /CH0080 (HB1439) Calvert County - Bonding Authority Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0736 (HB0892/CH0427) St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds Senator Waugh 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM