Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Capital Budget (B5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0015 (SB0470)
Title
Public School Facilities Security Improvements Program
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0103
Title
Capital Projects - Submission of Information to the General Assembly
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161 (SB0171/CH0463)
Title
Creation of State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2005, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, and 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0821 (SB0998/CH0575)
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064
Title
Capital Budget - Payment of State Debt Service
Sponsor
Delegate Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1532 (SB1094)
Title
Capital Grant Program for Public School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0171 /CH0463 (HB0161)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, and 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0470 (HB0015)
Title
Public School Facilities Security Improvements Program
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0726
Title
Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital Funds
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821
Title
Digital Equity for All Maryland Students Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0998 /CH0575 (HB0821)
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1094 (HB1532)
Title
Capital Grant Program for Public School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0015 (SB0470) Public School Facilities Security Improvements Program Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0103 Capital Projects - Submission of Information to the General Assembly Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0161 (SB0171/CH0463) Creation of State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2005, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, and 2013 Speaker 3 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Appropriations
HB0821 (SB0998/CH0575) Academic Facilities Bonding Authority Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1064 Capital Budget - Payment of State Debt Service Delegate Serafini 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1274 Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1532 (SB1094) Capital Grant Program for Public School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0171 /CH0463 (HB0161) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, and 2013 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0470 (HB0015) Public School Facilities Security Improvements Program Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0726 Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital Funds Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0821 Digital Equity for All Maryland Students Act of 2014 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0998 /CH0575 (HB0821) Academic Facilities Bonding Authority Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 575
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB1094 (HB1532) Capital Grant Program for Public School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM