Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ballots

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0029
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085
Title
Montgomery County - Board of Education - Primary Election Ballots MC 6-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226 (SB0311)
Title
Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public Communications
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284 /CH0082
Title
Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Law or Charter Amendment Summary
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0396 (SB0204/CH0332)
Title
Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0548
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0884 /CH0463
Title
Election Law - Counting of Properly Cast Ballots
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1017
Title
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064
Title
Election Law - Audits of Election Results
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1067
Title
Public Service Commission - Membership - Selection and Term
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1076
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0005 /CH0318
Title
Election Law - Canvass of Votes - Public Observation
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097 /CH0009
Title
Election Law - Counting of Properly Cast Ballots
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0193
Title
Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Law or Charter Amendment Summary
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204 /CH0332 (HB0396)
Title
Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311 (HB0226)
Title
Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public Communications
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0679
Title
Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General Election
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0711
Title
Election Law - Voting by Absentee Ballot - Prepaid Postage for the Return of Ballots
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0029 Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship Delegate Schulz 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Ways and Means
HB0085 Montgomery County - Board of Education - Primary Election Ballots MC 6-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0226 (SB0311) Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public Communications Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0284 /CH0082 Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Law or Charter Amendment Summary Delegate Flanagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0396 (SB0204/CH0332) Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year Delegate Turner 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0548 Circuit Court Judges - Election Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0884 /CH0463 Election Law - Counting of Properly Cast Ballots Delegate Lisanti 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1017 Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1064 Election Law - Audits of Election Results Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1067 Public Service Commission - Membership - Selection and Term Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1076 Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0005 /CH0318 Election Law - Canvass of Votes - Public Observation Senator Bates 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0097 /CH0009 Election Law - Counting of Properly Cast Ballots Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 9
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0193 Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Law or Charter Amendment Summary Senator Bates 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0204 /CH0332 (HB0396) Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0311 (HB0226) Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public Communications Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0679 Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General Election Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0711 Election Law - Voting by Absentee Ballot - Prepaid Postage for the Return of Ballots Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM