Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Banks and Trust Companies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0365 /CH0225 (SB0254)
Title
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0550 (SB0812)
Title
Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to Obligee
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0714 /CH0237 (SB0810)
Title
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723 /CH0421
Title
Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0728 (SB0222)
Title
Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned Properties
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0583/CH0306)
Title
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1165 /CH0349 (SB0875/CH0348)
Title
Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1298 (SB0395)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322 (SB0755)
Title
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008 (SJ0008)
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0222 (HB0728)
Title
Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned Properties
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0254 (HB0365/CH0225)
Title
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 (HB1298)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0583 /CH0306 (HB0735)
Title
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 (HB1322)
Title
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0810 (HB0714/CH0237)
Title
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812 (HB0550)
Title
Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to Obligee
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875 /CH0348 (HB1165/CH0349)
Title
Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0985 /CH0365
Title
Maryland Clean Energy Center - Green Banks and Clean Bank Financing - Study
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0008 (HJ0008)
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0010 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0365 /CH0225 (SB0254) Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution Delegate Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB0550 (SB0812) Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to Obligee Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0714 /CH0237 (SB0810) Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions Delegate Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0723 /CH0421 Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - Requirements Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0728 (SB0222) Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned Properties Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0735 (SB0583/CH0306) Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts Delegate Olszewski 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1165 /CH0349 (SB0875/CH0348) Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1298 (SB0395) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014 Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1322 (SB0755) Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HJ0008 (SJ0008) Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0222 (HB0728) Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned Properties Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0254 (HB0365/CH0225) Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution Senator Glassman 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0395 (HB1298) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0583 /CH0306 (HB0735) Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings Accounts Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0755 (HB1322) Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0810 (HB0714/CH0237) Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - Prohibitions Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0812 (HB0550) Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to Obligee Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0875 /CH0348 (HB1165/CH0349) Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Finance
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0985 /CH0365 Maryland Clean Energy Center - Green Banks and Clean Bank Financing - Study Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Finance
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SJ0008 (HJ0008) Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM