Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Barbers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0476 /CH0659 (SB0428/CH0660)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon and Barbershop License
Sponsor
Queen Anne's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953 (SB0439/CH0200)
Title
State Board of Barbers - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 /CH0251
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Barbers - Additional Students
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 /CH0660 (HB0476/CH0659)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon and Barbershop License
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 /CH0200 (HB0953)
Title
State Board of Barbers - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0476 /CH0659 (SB0428/CH0660) Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon and Barbershop License Queen Anne's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0953 (SB0439/CH0200) State Board of Barbers - Sunset Extension Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1021 /CH0251 Business Occupations and Professions - Barbers - Additional Students Delegate Glenn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Economic Matters
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0428 /CH0660 (HB0476/CH0659) Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon and Barbershop License Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 660
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0439 /CH0200 (HB0953) State Board of Barbers - Sunset Extension President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:18 PM