Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0177 /CH0789
Title
Killing or Wounding Black Bears - Penalties - Exemption for Protection of Managed Honey Bee Colonies
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0830 /CH0755 (SB0386)
Title
Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0830/CH0755)
Title
Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1158 /CH0372
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Solar Generation Facilities - Pollinator-Friendly Designation
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0177 /CH0789 Killing or Wounding Black Bears - Penalties - Exemption for Protection of Managed Honey Bee Colonies Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 789
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0830 /CH0755 (SB0386) Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and Prohibition Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 755
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0386 (HB0830/CH0755) Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and Prohibition Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1158 /CH0372 Department of Natural Resources - Solar Generation Facilities - Pollinator-Friendly Designation Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM