Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Beverage Containers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0061
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208 /CH0518 (SB0546/CH0517)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210 (SB0561)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226 (SB0049/CH0266)
Title
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0287
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0421
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0464 /CH0407
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses - Retail Sale - Prepackaged Beer
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Unlawful Drinking or Possessing an Open Container - Failure to Appear in Court
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers
Sponsor
Delegate James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1079 /CH0487
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0049 /CH0266 (HB0226)
Title
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0250 /CH0286
Title
Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0341 /CH0486
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0394
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Refund Program
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 /CH0517 (HB0208/CH0518)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 /CH0522
Title
Harford County - Class H-CC Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561 (HB0210)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0856
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1092
Title
Health General - Milk Products - Direct-to-Consumer Sale of Raw Milk
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0061 Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0208 /CH0518 (SB0546/CH0517) Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0210 (SB0561) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0226 (SB0049/CH0266) Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0287 Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses Delegate Otto 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0421 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permits Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0464 /CH0407 Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses - Retail Sale - Prepackaged Beer Delegate Schulz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0964 Alcoholic Beverages - Unlawful Drinking or Possessing an Open Container - Failure to Appear in Court Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0990 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers Delegate James 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1079 /CH0487 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0049 /CH0266 (HB0226) Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014 Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 266
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Economic Matters
SB0250 /CH0286 Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery Licenses Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0341 /CH0486 Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0394 Statewide Container Recycling Refund Program Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0546 /CH0517 (HB0208/CH0518) Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0552 /CH0522 Harford County - Class H-CC Alcoholic Beverages Licenses Senator Glassman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0561 (HB0210) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0856 Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1092 Health General - Milk Products - Direct-to-Consumer Sale of Raw Milk Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM