Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Beverage Containers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0088 /CH0061
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers MC 19-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0089 /CH0062
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BD-BWL License MC 18-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0273 (SB0500/CH0178)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Events, Licensing, Alcohol Awareness Requirements, and Fines
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0475
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Container Permits
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0756 /CH0273
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's County
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 (SB0634/CH0186)
Title
Washington County - Liquor Tasting License
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0835 /CH0105 (SB0633)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0982 (SB0684)
Title
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023 (SB0296)
Title
Public Schools - Thirsty Kids Act
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0296 (HB1023)
Title
Public Schools - Thirsty Kids Act
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0299 /CH0158
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Container Permits
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's County
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0500 /CH0178 (HB0273)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Events, Licensing, Alcohol Awareness Requirements, and Fines
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0633 (HB0835/CH0105)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0634 /CH0186 (HB0794)
Title
Washington County - Liquor Tasting License
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 (HB0982)
Title
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0088 /CH0061 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers MC 19-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0089 /CH0062 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BD-BWL License MC 18-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0273 (SB0500/CH0178) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Events, Licensing, Alcohol Awareness Requirements, and Fines Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0475 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Container Permits Harford County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0756 /CH0273 Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's County Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0794 (SB0634/CH0186) Washington County - Liquor Tasting License Washington County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0835 /CH0105 (SB0633) Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Refillable Container Permit Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0982 (SB0684) Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1023 (SB0296) Public Schools - Thirsty Kids Act Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0296 (HB1023) Public Schools - Thirsty Kids Act Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0299 /CH0158 Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Container Permits Harford County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0354 Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's County Senator Hershey 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0500 /CH0178 (HB0273) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Events, Licensing, Alcohol Awareness Requirements, and Fines Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0633 (HB0835/CH0105) Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Refillable Container Permit Washington County Senators 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0634 /CH0186 (HB0794) Washington County - Liquor Tasting License Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0684 (HB0982) Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM