Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bicycles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082 /CH0572 (SB0116/CH0573)
Title
Transportation – Complete Streets – Access to Healthy Food and Necessities
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0291)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0112 (SB0804)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0398 (SB0354)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, EPAMDs, or Motor Scooters
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0517 (SB0460/CH0519)
Title
Crosswalks – Violation of Pedestrian Right–of–Way – Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 /CH0439
Title
Transportation - State Highway Administration - Traffic Calming Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0614
Title
Montgomery County - Vehicle Laws - Prohibited Acts at Intersections MC 10-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0748 /CH0227 (SB0770)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885 /CH0377
Title
Transportation - Vision Zero - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939 /CH0063 (SB0935/CH0064)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1281 (SB0787)
Title
Transportation – Bikeways Network Program and Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0014
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Electric Transportation Devices - Definitions
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0573 (HB0082/CH0572)
Title
Transportation – Complete Streets – Access to Healthy Food and Necessities
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0291 (HB0108)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354 (HB0398)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 /CH0519 (HB0517)
Title
Pedestrian Safety Fund Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0770 (HB0748/CH0227)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB1281)
Title
Transportation - Bikeways Network Program - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0804 (HB0112)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Reckless Driving Contributing to an Accident – Required Court Appearance
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0935 /CH0064 (HB0939/CH0063)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0082 /CH0572 (SB0116/CH0573) Transportation – Complete Streets – Access to Healthy Food and Necessities Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 572
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0108 (SB0291) Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts Delegate Carr 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0112 (SB0804) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0398 (SB0354) Vehicle Laws – Overtaking and Passing Bicycles, EPAMDs, or Motor Scooters Delegate Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0517 (SB0460/CH0519) Crosswalks – Violation of Pedestrian Right–of–Way – Penalty Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0560 /CH0439 Transportation - State Highway Administration - Traffic Calming Devices Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0614 Montgomery County - Vehicle Laws - Prohibited Acts at Intersections MC 10-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0748 /CH0227 (SB0770) Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0885 /CH0377 Transportation - Vision Zero - Establishment Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0939 /CH0063 (SB0935/CH0064) Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation Delegate Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1281 (SB0787) Transportation – Bikeways Network Program and Central Maryland Regional Transit Plan Delegate Lierman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0014 Vehicle Laws - Personal Electric Transportation Devices - Definitions Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0116 /CH0573 (HB0082/CH0572) Transportation – Complete Streets – Access to Healthy Food and Necessities Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 573
Finance
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
SB0291 (HB0108) Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0354 (HB0398) Vehicle Laws - Overtaking and Passing Bicycles Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0460 /CH0519 (HB0517) Pedestrian Safety Fund Act of 2019 Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0770 (HB0748/CH0227) Vehicle Laws - Electric Low Speed Scooters Senator Smith 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0787 (HB1281) Transportation - Bikeways Network Program - Funding Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:45 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2019 - 1:45 PM
SB0804 (HB0112) Vehicle Laws – Reckless Driving Contributing to an Accident – Required Court Appearance Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0837 Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0935 /CH0064 (HB0939/CH0063) Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:18 PM