Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Bingo

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0350
Title
Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 16-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0545
Title
Carroll County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990
Title
Harford County - Bingo
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1426
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0383
Title
Baltimore City - Commercial Bingo - Permits
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006
Title
Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0350 Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 16-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0545 Carroll County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0990 Harford County - Bingo Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1426 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0383 Baltimore City - Commercial Bingo - Permits Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1006 Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-1)
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM