Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Birds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 /CH0433 (SB0002/CH0432)
Title
Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - Sundays
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0273 (SB0089)
Title
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0612 (SB0787)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0756 (SB0860)
Title
State Birds - Oriole and Raven
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0865 (SB0037)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Murphy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1047 (SB0530)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Patterson Park Audubon Center
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 /CH0432 (HB0066/CH0433)
Title
Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0037 (HB0865)
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0089 (HB0273)
Title
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530 (HB1047)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Patterson Park Audubon Center
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0619
Title
Wildlife Management and Sustainability Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754
Title
Hunting - Schools - Expanded Safety Zone
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB0612)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0860 (HB0756)
Title
State Birds - Oriole and Raven
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 /CH0433 (SB0002/CH0432) Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - Sundays Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0273 (SB0089) Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0612 (SB0787) Queen Anne's County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0756 (SB0860) State Birds - Oriole and Raven Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0865 (SB0037) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs Delegate Murphy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1047 (SB0530) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Patterson Park Audubon Center Delegate Hammen 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
SB0002 /CH0432 (HB0066/CH0433) Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - Sundays Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0037 (HB0865) Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of Costs Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0089 (HB0273) Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0530 (HB1047) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Patterson Park Audubon Center Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0619 Wildlife Management and Sustainability Act of 2013 Senator Astle 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0754 Hunting - Schools - Expanded Safety Zone Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Judicial Proceedings
SB0787 (HB0612) Queen Anne's County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0860 (HB0756) State Birds - Oriole and Raven Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM