Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Birds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0061 (SB1052)
Title
State Designations - State Waterfowl - Canvasback Duck
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0126 /CH0102
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0305 /CH0304 (SB0628)
Title
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0602 /CH0787 (SB0422/CH0788)
Title
Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655 (SB0519/CH0494)
Title
Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 (SB1008)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Phoenix Wildlife Center
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0422 /CH0788 (HB0602/CH0787)
Title
Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0519 /CH0494 (HB0655)
Title
Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628 (HB0305/CH0304)
Title
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1008 (HB1097)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Phoenix Wildlife Center
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1052 (HB0061)
Title
State Designations - State Waterfowl - Canvasback Duck
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1158 /CH0372
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Solar Generation Facilities - Pollinator-Friendly Designation
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0061 (SB1052) State Designations - State Waterfowl - Canvasback Duck Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0126 /CH0102 Natural Resources - Wildlife and Hunting Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0305 /CH0304 (SB0628) Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0602 /CH0787 (SB0422/CH0788) Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017 Delegate Robinson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 787
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0655 (SB0519/CH0494) Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1097 (SB1008) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Phoenix Wildlife Center Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 3:00 PM
SB0422 /CH0788 (HB0602/CH0787) Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 788
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0519 /CH0494 (HB0655) Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0628 (HB0305/CH0304) Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1008 (HB1097) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Phoenix Wildlife Center Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1052 (HB0061) State Designations - State Waterfowl - Canvasback Duck Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1158 /CH0372 Department of Natural Resources - Solar Generation Facilities - Pollinator-Friendly Designation Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM