Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Birds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 /CH0123
Title
Montgomery County - Archery Hunting Safety Zone - Position of Archery Hunter MC 24-18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0986 (SB1009)
Title
Department of General Services - Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Bird-Safe Buildings Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163 /CH0519
Title
Waterfowl Hunting Guide License - Guide Services for Hunting Snow Geese - Reciprocity
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1503
Title
State Designations - State Waterfowl - Canvasback Duck
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1699 (SB1166)
Title
Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094 /CH0670
Title
Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1009 (HB0986)
Title
Department of General Services – Bird–Safe Building Standards (Maryland Bird–Safe Buildings Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1166 (HB1699)
Title
Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0172 /CH0123 Montgomery County - Archery Hunting Safety Zone - Position of Archery Hunter MC 24-18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0986 (SB1009) Department of General Services - Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Bird-Safe Buildings Act of 2018) Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1163 /CH0519 Waterfowl Hunting Guide License - Guide Services for Hunting Snow Geese - Reciprocity Delegate Adams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1503 State Designations - State Waterfowl - Canvasback Duck Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1699 (SB1166) Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0094 /CH0670 Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and Mammals Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 670
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1009 (HB0986) Department of General Services – Bird–Safe Building Standards (Maryland Bird–Safe Buildings Act of 2018) Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1166 (HB1699) Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM