Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Birds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0136 (SB0314)
Title
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199 /CH0592
Title
Wicomico County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 /CH0171
Title
Cecil County - Natural Resources - Hunting
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0728
Title
State Parks and Forests - Hunting - Use of Off-Road Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0904 (SB0546/CH0760)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1110 (SB0140/CH0265)
Title
Washington County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1356
Title
Talbot County - Turkey Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1378 (SB0293)
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Migratory Game Birds
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0056 /CH0128
Title
Secretary of Agriculture - Regulation of Poultry to Protect Animal Health and Control Avian Influenza
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0140 /CH0265 (HB1110)
Title
Washington County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0293 (HB1378)
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Migratory Game Birds
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0314 (HB0136)
Title
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0390 /CH0242
Title
Natural Resources – Sunday Hunting – St. Mary’s County
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 /CH0760 (HB0904)
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0136 (SB0314) Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019) Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (93-40)
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0199 /CH0592 Wicomico County - Deer Hunting - Sundays Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0242 /CH0171 Cecil County - Natural Resources - Hunting Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0728 State Parks and Forests - Hunting - Use of Off-Road Vehicles Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0904 (SB0546/CH0760) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1110 (SB0140/CH0265) Washington County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1356 Talbot County - Turkey Hunting - Sundays Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1378 (SB0293) Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Migratory Game Birds Delegate Anderton 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0056 /CH0128 Secretary of Agriculture - Regulation of Poultry to Protect Animal Health and Control Avian Influenza Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2019 - 4:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0140 /CH0265 (HB1110) Washington County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0293 (HB1378) Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Migratory Game Birds Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0314 (HB0136) Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving and Bird-Safe Building Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2019) Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (97-40)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0390 /CH0242 Natural Resources – Sunday Hunting – St. Mary’s County Senator Bailey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0546 /CH0760 (HB0904) Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:18 PM