Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Birth Control -see also- Reproductive Matters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135 /CH0064 (SB0137/CH0065)
Title
Health Insurance – Coverage for Male Sterilization – High–Deductible Health Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0994 /CH0464 (SB0774/CH0465)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Family Planning Services
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 /CH0510 (SB0986/CH0511)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Contraceptive Drugs and Devices and Male Sterilization
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1111 (SB0969)
Title
Public Health - Access to Emergency Contraception - Student Health Centers and Vending Machines
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1283 /CH0450
Title
Health Insurance - Prescription Contraceptives - Coverage for Single Dispensing
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1558 /CH0461
Title
Pharmacists - Dispensing of Prescription Drugs - Single Dispensing of Dosage Units
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1650
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Maryland Teenage Pregnancy Prevention Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 /CH0465 (HB0994/CH0464)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Family Planning Services
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0969 (HB1111)
Title
Public Health - Access to Emergency Contraception - Student Health Centers and Vending Machines
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0986 /CH0511 (HB1024/CH0510)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Contraceptive Drugs and Devices and Male Sterilization
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 /CH0064 (SB0137/CH0065) Health Insurance – Coverage for Male Sterilization – High–Deductible Health Plans Delegate Hill 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0994 /CH0464 (SB0774/CH0465) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Family Planning Services Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1024 /CH0510 (SB0986/CH0511) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Contraceptive Drugs and Devices and Male Sterilization Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
2/23/2018 - 2:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1111 (SB0969) Public Health - Access to Emergency Contraception - Student Health Centers and Vending Machines Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1283 /CH0450 Health Insurance - Prescription Contraceptives - Coverage for Single Dispensing Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1558 /CH0461 Pharmacists - Dispensing of Prescription Drugs - Single Dispensing of Dosage Units Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1650 Maryland Department of Health - Maryland Teenage Pregnancy Prevention Grant Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0774 /CH0465 (HB0994/CH0464) Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Family Planning Services Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Finance
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0969 (HB1111) Public Health - Access to Emergency Contraception - Student Health Centers and Vending Machines Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0986 /CH0511 (HB1024/CH0510) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Contraceptive Drugs and Devices and Male Sterilization Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM