Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Blind Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0216
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Student Hearing and Vision Screenings - Reporting Requirements PG 504-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0798 /CH0311
Title
Visual Impairments - Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1075
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Preferences - Nonprofits
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1088 /CH0631
Title
State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1206
Title
Department of Information Technology - Remote Access Information Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1552
Title
Procurement - Preferred Providers - Price Determinations, Work Opportunities, and Subcontracting
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1783 /CH0014 (SB1243)
Title
21st Century School Facilities Act
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0482
Title
Remote Access Information Program for Deaf-Blind Individuals - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 /CH0312
Title
Visual Impairments – Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act)
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0216 Prince George's County Board of Education - Student Hearing and Vision Screenings - Reporting Requirements PG 504-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0798 /CH0311 Visual Impairments - Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act) Delegate Kittleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1075 State Finance and Procurement - Preferences - Nonprofits Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1088 /CH0631 State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual Access Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1206 Department of Information Technology - Remote Access Information Program - Establishment Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1552 Procurement - Preferred Providers - Price Determinations, Work Opportunities, and Subcontracting Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1783 /CH0014 (SB1243) 21st Century School Facilities Act Delegate Jones 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14
Appropriations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0482 Remote Access Information Program for Deaf-Blind Individuals - Establishment Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0570 /CH0312 Visual Impairments – Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act) Senator Bates 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM