Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Blue Laws

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 /CH0072 (SB0198/CH0071)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Hours of Sale
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0315 /CH0442
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Contracts to Sell Liquor for Off-Premises Consumption MC 18-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 /CH0130
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Hours of Sale MC 8-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645 (SB0518/CH0075)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Events - Sunday Hours of Operation
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929 /CH0144
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096 /CH0145
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales and Privileges
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1136 /CH0601 (SB1153)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses - Hours of Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1430 /CH0429 (SB0492)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater License)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1585
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0198 /CH0071 (HB0178/CH0072)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Hours of Sale
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0492 (HB1430/CH0429)
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater License)
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Off-Sale Permit - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0518 /CH0075 (HB0645)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Events - Sunday Hours of Operation
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1153 (HB1136/CH0601)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses - Hours of Sale
Sponsor
Senator Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1172
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Breweries - Barrelage and Hours of Sale
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0178 /CH0072 (SB0198/CH0071) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Hours of Sale Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0315 /CH0442 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Contracts to Sell Liquor for Off-Premises Consumption MC 18-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0560 /CH0130 Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Hours of Sale MC 8-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0645 (SB0518/CH0075) Frederick County - Gaming Events - Sunday Hours of Operation Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0929 /CH0144 Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses and Sunday Sales Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 /CH0145 Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales and Privileges Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1136 /CH0601 (SB1153) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses - Hours of Sale Delegate Ali 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 601
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1430 /CH0429 (SB0492) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater License) Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1585 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0198 /CH0071 (HB0178/CH0072) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Hours of Sale Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0492 (HB1430/CH0429) Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater License) Washington County Senators 4 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0513 Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Off-Sale Permit - Repeal Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0518 /CH0075 (HB0645) Frederick County - Gaming Events - Sunday Hours of Operation Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0743 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1153 (HB1136/CH0601) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses - Hours of Sale Senator Oaks 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1172 Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Breweries - Barrelage and Hours of Sale Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM