Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Bridges and Tunnels

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0056 /CH0611 (SB0013)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group and Transportation Facilities Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 /CH0089
Title
Transportation - Potomac River Bridges Towing Compact - Inclusion of Additional Bridges
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0258
Title
Prince George's County - State Highways - Toll Facilities PG 402-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292 (SB0229)
Title
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0480
Title
Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Shoppers Discount Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0513
Title
Transportation - Toll Discount Plans - Francis Scott Key Bridge
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519
Title
Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Commuter Toll Discount Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0520
Title
Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Toll Discount Plan
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572 (SB0252)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Affected Counties - Infrastructure Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645 (SB0461/CH0285)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220
Title
Public–Private Partnerships – Highway and Bridge Toll Facilities – Rates (No Lexus Lane Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1249
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland State Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013 (HB0056/CH0611)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229 (HB0292)
Title
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0252 (HB0572)
Title
Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Affected Counties - Infrastructure Funding
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456
Title
Transportation - Third Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Study
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 /CH0285 (HB0645)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0557
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Vehicle Not Using Bridge - No Toll Payment Required
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1069
Title
Transportation - Eastern Shore Counties - Construction of Toll Roads
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0056 /CH0611 (SB0013) Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group and Transportation Facilities Projects Delegate Arentz 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2020 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0162 /CH0089 Transportation - Potomac River Bridges Towing Compact - Inclusion of Additional Bridges Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 89
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0258 Prince George's County - State Highways - Toll Facilities PG 402-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0292 (SB0229) Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0480 Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Shoppers Discount Plan Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0513 Transportation - Toll Discount Plans - Francis Scott Key Bridge Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0519 Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Commuter Toll Discount Plan Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0520 Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Toll Discount Plan Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0572 (SB0252) Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Affected Counties - Infrastructure Funding Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0645 (SB0461/CH0285) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1220 Public–Private Partnerships – Highway and Bridge Toll Facilities – Rates (No Lexus Lane Act) Delegate Barve 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB1249 I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland State Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2020) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (97-36)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0013 (HB0056/CH0611) Chesapeake Bay Bridge – Reconstruction Advisory Group Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Finance
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0229 (HB0292) Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Finance
1/29/2020 - 2:45 PM
SB0252 (HB0572) Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Affected Counties - Infrastructure Funding Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0456 Transportation - Third Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Study Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0461 /CH0285 (HB0645) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 285
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0557 Maryland Transportation Authority - Vehicle Not Using Bridge - No Toll Payment Required Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1069 Transportation - Eastern Shore Counties - Construction of Toll Roads Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:14 PM