Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Budget and Management, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Central Collection Unit - Collection of Debt - Liens
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0152 /CH0023 (SB0172)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324 (SB0580/CH0680)
Title
State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0450 (SB0568)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Prescription Drugs and Devices - Copayment or Coinsurance Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0614 (SB0483)
Title
State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Pay Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 (SB0655)
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 /CH0590
Title
Reorganization of State Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 (SB0921)
Title
State Personnel - Special Appointments in the Skilled and Professional Services
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1193
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0483 (HB0614)
Title
State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Pay Rates
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0568 (HB0450)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Prescription Drugs and Devices - Copayment or Coinsurance Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580 /CH0680 (HB0324)
Title
State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal Leave
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0655 (HB0895)
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839
Title
Workgroup on Categories for Funding Priorities in the Annual State Budget
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0921 (HB1161)
Title
State Personnel - Special Appointments in the Skilled and Professional Services
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1024 /CH0607 (HB0684/CH0006)
Title
Education - State Grants for Education Aid
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1084 /CH0709 (HB0587/CH0708)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 Central Collection Unit - Collection of Debt - Liens Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0152 /CH0023 (SB0172) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0324 (SB0580/CH0680) State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal Leave Delegate Korman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0450 (SB0568) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Prescription Drugs and Devices - Copayment or Coinsurance Requirements Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0614 (SB0483) State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Pay Rates Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0895 (SB0655) Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0966 Legislative and Congressional Districting Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1021 /CH0590 Reorganization of State Procurement Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1161 (SB0921) State Personnel - Special Appointments in the Skilled and Professional Services Delegate Jones 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
HB1192 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1193 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
SB0483 (HB0614) State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Pay Rates Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0530 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0568 (HB0450) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Prescription Drugs and Devices - Copayment or Coinsurance Requirements Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0580 /CH0680 (HB0324) State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal Leave Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 680
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0655 (HB0895) Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0839 Workgroup on Categories for Funding Priorities in the Annual State Budget Senator Serafini 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0921 (HB1161) State Personnel - Special Appointments in the Skilled and Professional Services Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1024 /CH0607 (HB0684/CH0006) Education - State Grants for Education Aid Senator McFadden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 607
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1084 /CH0709 (HB0587/CH0708) State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and Penalties Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 709
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM