Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Building Codes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0207 /CH0589
Title
State Capital Projects - High Performance Buildings - Maryland Green Building Council
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0361
Title
State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947 /CH0495
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1119 (SB0877)
Title
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0401 /CH0494
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1119)
Title
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Local Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1053
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards - Energy Codes - Local Authority
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0207 /CH0589 State Capital Projects - High Performance Buildings - Maryland Green Building Council Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0361 State Plumbing Code - Adoption of International Code Council Standards Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0947 /CH0495 Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law) Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1119 (SB0877) Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local Licenses Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0401 /CH0494 Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law) Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 (HB1119) Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Local Licenses Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1053 Maryland Building Performance Standards - Energy Codes - Local Authority Senator Glassman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM