Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Building Codes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0019
Title
Public Safety - Building Performance Standards - Local Amendments to Fire Sprinkler Systems Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057 /CH0083
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Adoption, Implementation, and Enforcement of Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0711 (SB0643)
Title
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas Codes
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0845 (SB0519)
Title
Washington County - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Local Enforcement
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1412
Title
Real Property - New Residential Property - Information on Renewable Energy Alternatives
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1429
Title
Recovery Home Residential Rights Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0033 (HB0642/CH0110)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0519 (HB0845)
Title
Washington County - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Local Enforcement
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 (HB0711)
Title
State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas Codes
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0019 Public Safety - Building Performance Standards - Local Amendments to Fire Sprinkler Systems Provisions Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0057 /CH0083 Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Adoption, Implementation, and Enforcement of Modifications Delegate Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2016 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0711 (SB0643) State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas Codes Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0845 (SB0519) Washington County - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Local Enforcement Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1412 Real Property - New Residential Property - Information on Renewable Energy Alternatives Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1429 Recovery Home Residential Rights Protection Act Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0033 (HB0642/CH0110) Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Senator Astle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0519 (HB0845) Washington County - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Modifications - Local Enforcement Washington County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0643 (HB0711) State Board of Plumbing - State Plumbing Code - Adoption of the International Plumbing and Fuel Gas Codes Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM