Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Building Codes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Funding for Newly Constructed Single-Family Homes
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970
Title
Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1311 (SB0722)
Title
Public Safety - Light Frame Combustible Construction - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0722 (HB1311)
Title
Public Safety - Light Frame Combustible Construction - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0107 Department of Housing and Community Development - Funding for Newly Constructed Single-Family Homes Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/31/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB0970 Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1311 (SB0722) Public Safety - Light Frame Combustible Construction - Requirements Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0722 (HB1311) Public Safety - Light Frame Combustible Construction - Requirements Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM