Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Building Codes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645 /CH0205 (SB0662/CH0206)
Title
Business Regulation – Wireless Security Systems – Local Government Licenses and Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0694 /CH0673
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Transfer of Administration to Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1079
Title
Frederick County and Prince George’s County – Building and Housing Codes – Materials Used to Board or Secure Residential Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1219
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Claims Regarding Neighborhood Blight
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1481 /CH0680 (SB0648/CH0681)
Title
Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0648 /CH0681 (HB1481/CH0680)
Title
Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 /CH0206 (HB0645/CH0205)
Title
Business Regulation – Wireless Security Systems – Local Government Licenses and Permits
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0645 /CH0205 (SB0662/CH0206) Business Regulation – Wireless Security Systems – Local Government Licenses and Permits Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0694 /CH0673 Public Safety - Building Codes - Transfer of Administration to Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 673
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
HB1079 Frederick County and Prince George’s County – Building and Housing Codes – Materials Used to Board or Secure Residential Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1219 Department of Housing and Community Development - Claims Regarding Neighborhood Blight Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1481 /CH0680 (SB0648/CH0681) Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 680
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0648 /CH0681 (HB1481/CH0680) Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0662 /CH0206 (HB0645/CH0205) Business Regulation – Wireless Security Systems – Local Government Licenses and Permits Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Finance
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM