Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Building Codes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0217
Title
Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515 /CH0369
Title
Municipalities - Municipal Infraction Proceedings - Designation of a Building Inspector or an Enforcement Officer to Testify
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0826
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment (Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1055
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Notice of Eligibility - Lead Registry and Code Compliance
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Electric Vehicle Charging Infrastructure
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0217 Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association Standing Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0515 /CH0369 Municipalities - Municipal Infraction Proceedings - Designation of a Building Inspector or an Enforcement Officer to Testify Delegate Hornberger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0826 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment (Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1055 Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Notice of Eligibility - Lead Registry and Code Compliance Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0987 Public Safety - Building Codes - Electric Vehicle Charging Infrastructure Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:19 PM