Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Burglary

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0185 (SB0683)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214
Title
Criminal Law - Self-Defense - Immunity for Use of Physical Force in Defense of Dwelling
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222 /CH0218
Title
Education - Reportable Offenses - First Degree Burglary and Animal Cruelty
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306 /CH0116 (SB0337/CH0115)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 (SB0802)
Title
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Burglary
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0807 /CH0238 (SB0742)
Title
Criminal Law - Burglary in the First Degree - Home Invasion
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1137
Title
Crimes - Robbery or Theft of Property - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1185
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0337 /CH0115 (HB0306/CH0116)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683 (HB0185)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0742 (HB0807/CH0238)
Title
Criminal Law - Burglary in the First Degree - Home Invasion
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0802 (HB0782)
Title
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Burglary
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0185 (SB0683) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0214 Criminal Law - Self-Defense - Immunity for Use of Physical Force in Defense of Dwelling Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0222 /CH0218 Education - Reportable Offenses - First Degree Burglary and Animal Cruelty Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 /CH0116 (SB0337/CH0115) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0782 (SB0802) Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Burglary Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0807 /CH0238 (SB0742) Criminal Law - Burglary in the First Degree - Home Invasion Delegate Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1137 Crimes - Robbery or Theft of Property - Controlled Dangerous Substances Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1185 Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0337 /CH0115 (HB0306/CH0116) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0683 (HB0185) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0742 (HB0807/CH0238) Criminal Law - Burglary in the First Degree - Home Invasion Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0802 (HB0782) Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Burglary Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM