Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Buses -see also- School Buses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162
Title
Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0891 (SB1035)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1486
Title
Workgroup on Transportation for Middle and High School Students in Prince George's County PG 440-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1607 (SB1052/CH0025)
Title
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183
Title
School Vehicles - Seat Belts - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0199
Title
Transit and Transportation Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1035 (HB0891)
Title
Transportation - Transit Service - State Grants and Farebox Recovery Rate
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1052 /CH0025 (HB1607)
Title
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0162 Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0777 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0891 (SB1035) Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - Repeal Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1486 Workgroup on Transportation for Middle and High School Students in Prince George's County PG 440-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1607 (SB1052/CH0025) University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0183 School Vehicles - Seat Belts - Requirements Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0199 Transit and Transportation Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1035 (HB0891) Transportation - Transit Service - State Grants and Farebox Recovery Rate Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB1052 /CH0025 (HB1607) University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016 Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2016 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM