Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Business Trusts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Foreign Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0702 /CH0068 (SB0622/CH0067)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140 /CH0528 (SB0697/CH0527)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1166 (SB0777/CH0321)
Title
Insurance - Ceding Insurers and Reinsurance
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0001
Title
Income Tax - Pass-Through Entity - Maximum Rate
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 /CH0175
Title
Business and Economic Development - Enterprise Fund and Invest Maryland Program
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0622 /CH0067 (HB0702/CH0068)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0527 (HB1140/CH0528)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0777 /CH0321 (HB1166)
Title
Insurance - Ceding Insurers and Reinsurance
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0540 Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Foreign Entities Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0702 /CH0068 (SB0622/CH0067) Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1140 /CH0528 (SB0697/CH0527) Corporations and Associations - Conversions Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1166 (SB0777/CH0321) Insurance - Ceding Insurers and Reinsurance Delegate Davis 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0001 Income Tax - Pass-Through Entity - Maximum Rate Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
SB0070 /CH0175 Business and Economic Development - Enterprise Fund and Invest Maryland Program Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0622 /CH0067 (HB0702/CH0068) Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and Processing Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0697 /CH0527 (HB1140/CH0528) Corporations and Associations - Conversions Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0777 /CH0321 (HB1166) Insurance - Ceding Insurers and Reinsurance Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM