Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Business Trusts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135
Title
Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and Affidavit
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0276 /CH0352 (SB0137/CH0351)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457 (SB0385)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0461 (SB0388)
Title
Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and Funding
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0471 (SB0622)
Title
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0743
Title
Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226 /CH0224 (SB0597/CH0223)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1250 (SB0841)
Title
Income Tax - Pass-Through Entities - Exemption
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 /CH0351 (HB0276/CH0352)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0161 /CH0658 (HB0336/CH0619)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0385 (HB0457)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0388 (HB0461)
Title
Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and Funding
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0597 /CH0223 (HB1226/CH0224)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0622 (HB0471)
Title
Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0633
Title
State Employees' Retirement Savings Plan
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0841 (HB1250)
Title
Income Tax - Pass-Through Entities - Exemption
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and Affidavit Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0276 /CH0352 (SB0137/CH0351) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0457 (SB0385) Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0461 (SB0388) Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and Funding Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0471 (SB0622) Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0743 Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure Task Force Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1226 /CH0224 (SB0597/CH0223) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - Exemptions Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1250 (SB0841) Income Tax - Pass-Through Entities - Exemption Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0137 /CH0351 (HB0276/CH0352) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0161 /CH0658 (HB0336/CH0619) Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture Senator Hough 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0385 (HB0457) Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0388 (HB0461) Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and Funding President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0597 /CH0223 (HB1226/CH0224) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - Exemptions Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0622 (HB0471) Income Tax - Angel Investor Tax Credit Program Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0633 State Employees' Retirement Savings Plan Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 8:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2016 - 8:30 AM
SB0841 (HB1250) Income Tax - Pass-Through Entities - Exemption President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM