Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Corporations and Associations (C1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135
Title
Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and Affidavit
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0201
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Resident Agent and Company Representative
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354 /CH0171 (SB0148/CH0170)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457 (SB0385)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0812 (SB0432)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1378 /CH0324 (SB1007/CH0323)
Title
Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program and Trust
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1419 (SB0034)
Title
Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1444 /CH0652
Title
Mary Byrd Wyman Memorial Association of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1446 /CH0653
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Recordation of Governing and Charter Documents - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1513 (SB1056)
Title
Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1544 (SB1065)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 (HB1419)
Title
Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066 /CH0335
Title
Professional Corporations - Approval of Corporate Name by Licensing Unit and Professional Organization - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0148 /CH0170 (HB0354/CH0171)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From Liability
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0385 (HB0457)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 (HB0812)
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0501
Title
Shareholders United Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1007 /CH0323 (HB1378/CH0324)
Title
Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program and Trust
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1056 (HB1513)
Title
Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1065 (HB1544)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and Affidavit Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0201 Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Resident Agent and Company Representative Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0354 /CH0171 (SB0148/CH0170) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From Liability Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0457 (SB0385) Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0812 (SB0432) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2016 Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1378 /CH0324 (SB1007/CH0323) Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program and Trust Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1419 (SB0034) Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined Reporting Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1444 /CH0652 Mary Byrd Wyman Memorial Association of Baltimore City Delegate Aumann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1446 /CH0653 State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Recordation of Governing and Charter Documents - Prohibitions Delegate McComas 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1513 (SB1056) Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1544 (SB1065) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0034 (HB1419) Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined Reporting Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0066 /CH0335 Professional Corporations - Approval of Corporate Name by Licensing Unit and Professional Organization - Exemption Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0148 /CH0170 (HB0354/CH0171) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From Liability Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0385 (HB0457) Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0432 (HB0812) Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2016 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0501 Shareholders United Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1007 /CH0323 (HB1378/CH0324) Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program and Trust Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Economic Matters
SB1056 (HB1513) Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by Merger Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1065 (HB1544) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM