Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Corporations and Associations (C1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0386)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204 (SB0359)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fee Study
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254 /CH0138
Title
Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0668 /CH0292 (SB0469/CH0293)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0804 (SB0369)
Title
Workgroup to Study Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0891
Title
Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0983 /CH0400 (SB0888/CH0401)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Series - Conversion
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0999 /CH0606 (SB0540)
Title
Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1393
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fee - Annual Report of a Low-Income Limited Liability Company
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1448
Title
Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Classification of Employees and Independent Contractors - Guidelines
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1478 (SB0913)
Title
Commercial Law - Merchant Cash Advance - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1606
Title
Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0359 (HB0204)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Disadvantaged Business Enterprises and Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Filing Fee Exemption and Study
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0369 (HB0804)
Title
Workgroup to Study Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0058)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0469 /CH0293 (HB0668/CH0292)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0540 (HB0999/CH0606)
Title
Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0888 /CH0401 (HB0983/CH0400)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Series - Conversion
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0913 (HB1478)
Title
Commercial Law - Merchant Cash Advance - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0386) Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0204 (SB0359) Corporations and Associations - Filing Fee Study Delegate Qi 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0254 /CH0138 Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 138
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0668 /CH0292 (SB0469/CH0293) Corporations and Associations - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 292
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0804 (SB0369) Workgroup to Study Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0891 Foreign Corporations - Resident Agents - State Department of Assessments and Taxation Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0983 /CH0400 (SB0888/CH0401) Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Series - Conversion Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 400
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0999 /CH0606 (SB0540) Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020) Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 606
Economic Matters
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1393 Corporations and Associations - Filing Fee - Annual Report of a Low-Income Limited Liability Company Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1448 Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Classification of Employees and Independent Contractors - Guidelines Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1478 (SB0913) Commercial Law - Merchant Cash Advance - Prohibition Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1606 Corporations and Associations - Fees for Processing Articles of Dissolution, Certificates of Cancellation, and Other Documents - Repeal Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0359 (HB0204) Corporations and Associations - Disadvantaged Business Enterprises and Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Filing Fee Exemption and Study Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0369 (HB0804) Workgroup to Study Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0386 (HB0058) Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0469 /CH0293 (HB0668/CH0292) Corporations and Associations - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 293
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2020 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0540 (HB0999/CH0606) Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020) Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0888 /CH0401 (HB0983/CH0400) Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies and Partnerships - Series - Conversion Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 401
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0913 (HB1478) Commercial Law - Merchant Cash Advance - Prohibition Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:59 PM